Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1210
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1210
Title:Seneca County, New York, Petitioner
v.
Cayuga Indian Nation of New York
Docketed:March 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-0032)
   Decision Date:October 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2021 to May 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 3, 2021.
May 03 2021Brief of respondent Cayuga Nation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
May 18 2021Reply of petitioner Seneca County, New York filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Seneca County, New York
Attorneys for Respondent
David W. DeBruin
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

DDeBruin@jenner.com
202-639-6015
Party name: Cayuga Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543