Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1207
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1207
Title:Alexander Balbuena, Petitioner
v.
Brian Cates, Acting Warden
Docketed:March 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-16414)
   Decision Date:November 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Mar 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2021 to May 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 3, 2021.
Apr 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Federal Public Defender, District of Nevada, District of Arizona, Central District of California, and Eastern District of California filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 03 2021Brief of respondent Brian Cates in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2021Reply of petitioner Alexander Balbuena filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
Jun 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 14 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: Alexander Balbuena
Attorneys for Respondent
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

josh.patashnik@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3896
Party name: Brian Cates
Other
Jonathan Michael Kirshbaum
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, District of Nevada
411 E. Bonneville Avenue, Suite 250
Las Vegas, NV 89101

jonathan_kirshbaum@fd.org
702-388-6577
Party name: Federal Public Defender, District of Nevada, District of Arizona, Central District of California, and Eastern District of California

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543