Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1203
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1203
Title:Moose Jooce, et al., Petitioners
v.
Food and Drug Administration, et al.
Docketed:March 3, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5048, 20-5049, 20-5050)
   Decision Date:December 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Moose Jooce, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2021 to May 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 3, 2021.
Mar 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2021 to June 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 2, 2021.
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of 36 National and State Electronic Nicotine Delivery System Product Advocacy Associations and Representative Industry Stakeholders filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2021Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Senator Rand Paul, Senator Ron Johnson and Representative Jim Baird filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dschiff@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Moose Jooce, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Food & Drug Administration, et al.
Other
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Senator Rand Paul, Senator Ron Johnson and Representative Jim Baird
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
J. Gregory Troutman
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Law Office, PLLC.
4205 Springhurst Boulevard
Suite 201
Louisville, KY 40241

jgtatty@yahoo.com
5024129179
Party name: 36 National and State Electronic Nicotine Delivery System Product Advocacy Associations and Representative Industry Stakeholders

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543