Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1200
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1200
Vide 20-1536
Title:Common Ground Healthcare Cooperative, On Behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1286)
   Decision Date:September 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 16, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Common Ground Healthcare Cooperative, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2021 to April 30, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 30, 2021.
Apr 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Anthem, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Highmark Inc., L.A. Care Health Plan, and Molina Healthcare of California, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2021Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 01 2021Reply of petitioners Common Ground Healthcare Cooperative, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
865 S. Figueroa St.
10th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(213) 443-3000
Party name: Common Ground Healthcare Cooperative, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Lawrence S. Sher
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1301 K Street, NW
Suite 1000 - East Tower
Washington, DC 20005

lsher@reedsmith.com
(202) 414-9200
Party name: Anthem, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Highmark Inc., L.A. Care Health Plan, and Molina Healthcare of California, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543