Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1190
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1190
Title:Richard D. Simmons, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:February 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1519)
   Decision Date:July 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent McDonough, Denis to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 24 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Dorsett Niles
    Counsel of Record
Carpenter, Chartered
1525 SW Topeka Blvd., Suite D
Topeka, KS 66601

john@carpenterchartered.com
(785) 357-5251
Party name: Richard Simmons
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: McDonough, Denis
Other
Stacey Michelle Bosshardt
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

sbosshardt@perkinscoie.com
202.661.5862
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543