Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1165
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1165
Title:Lakshmi Arunachalam, Petitioner
v.
Citigroup, Inc., et al.
Docketed:February 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-2196)
   Decision Date:November 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2021)
AppendixPetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
May 03 2021Petition DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lakshmi Arunachalam222 Stanford Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025

(650) 690-0995
Party name: Lakshmi Arunachalam

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543