Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1163
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1163
Title:Gloucester County School Board, Petitioner
v.
Gavin Grimm
Docketed:February 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1952)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 22, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gloucester County School Board
Blanket Consent
Mar 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2021 to May 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 25, 2021.
Mar 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Pennsylvania Students filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Pacific Justice Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 25 2021Brief of respondent Gavin Grimm in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 07 2021Reply of petitioner Gloucester County School Board filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 21 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner Gloucester County School Board filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas and Justice Alito would grant the petition for a writ of certiorari.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Gloucester County School Board
Attorneys for Respondent
Joshua A. Block
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
Floor 18
New York, NY 10004

jblock@aclu.org
2125492593
Party name: Gavin Grimm
Other
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Pacific Justice Institute, et al.
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Pennsylvania Students

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543