Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1162
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1162
Vide 20-1432
Title:Maine Community Health Options, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:February 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2102, 2019-1633)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2021 to April 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 26, 2021.
Mar 11 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Maine Community Health Options, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 25 2021Brief amici curiae of Anthem, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Association for Community Affiliated Plans filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 09 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 01 2021Reply of petitioners Maine Community Health Options, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Maine Community Health Options, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Association for Community Affiliated Plans
Lawrence S. Sher
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1301 K Street, NW
Suite 1000 - East Tower
Washington, DC 20005

lsher@reedsmith.com
(202) 414-9200
Party name: Anthem, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Highmark Inc., L.A. Care Health Plan, and Molina Healthcare of California, Inc.
Paul J. Zidlicky
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

pzidlicky@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543