Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1151
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1151
Title:Libertarian Party of Erie County, et al., Petitioners
v.
Andrew M. Cuomo, Individually and as Governor of the State of New York, et al.
Docketed:February 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-386)
   Decision Date:August 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2021Supplemental brief of petitioners Libertarian Party of Erie County, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2021 to April 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 26, 2021.
Apr 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 26, 2021 to May 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including May 25, 2021.
May 25 2021Brief of respondents Andrew M. Cuomo, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2021Reply of petitioners Libertarian Party of Erie County, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 29 2021Letter of May 29, 2021 from counsel for respondents written to correct factual error in brief in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Kuzma
    Counsel of Record
Michael Kuzma
1893 Clinton Street
Buffalo, NY 14206

michaelkuzmaesq@gmail.com
(716) 822-7645
Party name: Libertarian Party of Erie County, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Andrew M. Cuomo, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543