Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1148
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1148
Title:Robert M. Sellers, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:February 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1769)
   Decision Date:July 15, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 24, 2021 to April 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 23, 2021.
Mar 23 2021Amicus brief of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium not accepted for filing. (March 23, 2021)
Mar 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium filed. (3/25/2021)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Organization of Veterans' Advocates, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Brief of respondent Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 26 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 11, 2021 to May 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 28 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until May 18, 2021 granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Robert M. Sellers
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Other
Angela K. Drake
    Counsel of Record
The Veterans Clinic at the University of Missouri-Columbia School of Law
203 Hulston Hall
Columbia, MO 65211

drakea@missouri.edu
573-882-7630
Party name: National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium
Michael E. Joffre
    Counsel of Record
Sterne, Kessler, Goldstein & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mjoffre@sternekessler.com
202-772-8856
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy, Inc.
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: National Organization of Veterans' Advocates, Inc.
Teena-Ann Varghese Sankoorikal
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

tsankoorikal@cov.com
202-662-6000
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543