Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1138
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1138
Title:Cimznhca, LLC, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2273)
   Decision Date:August 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 22, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 22, 2021 to April 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 21, 2021.
Apr 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2021 to May 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 21, 2021.
May 21 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Leslie LeeAnn Pescia
    Counsel of Record
Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C.
PO Box 4160
Montgomery, AL 36103

leslie.pescia@beasleyallen.com
(334) 269-2343
Party name: Cimznhca, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543