Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1120
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1120
Title:Melissa Belgau, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jay Inslee, Governor of Washington, et al.
Docketed:February 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35137)
   Decision Date:September 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 26, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2021Waiver of right of respondents Washington Federation of State Employees, AFSCME Council 28 to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 16 2021Waiver of right of respondents Jay Inslee, et al. (does not include WFSE) to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Cara O'Callaghan, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Washington State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mackinac Center for Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute; National Taxpayers Union filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Alaska, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Louisiana, Montana, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Mar 29 2021Response Requested. (Due April 28, 2021)
Mar 31 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 28, 2021 to May 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 12, 2021, for all repondents.
Apr 13 2021Letter of respondents pertaining to Rule 35.3 received.
Main Document
May 12 2021Brief of State Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2021Brief of respondent Washington Federation of State Employees, AFSCME Council 28 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2021Reply of petitioners Melissa Belgau, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James Gideon Abernathy
    Counsel of Record
c/o Freedom Foundation
PO Box 552
Olympia, WA 98507

JamesGAbernathy@gmail.com
3609563482
Party name: Melissa Belgau, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: Washington Federation of State Employees, AFSCME Council 28
Alicia Orlena Young
    Counsel of Record
Washington Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street SE
PO Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

alicia.young@atg.wa.gov
360-586-2697
Party name: Jay Inslee, et al. (does not include WFSE)
Other
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

mike@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: States of Alaska, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Louisiana, Montana, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia
Matthew Conrad Forys
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Avenue, Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

matt@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6100
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute; National Taxpayers Union
Harry J.F. Korrell III
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1201 Third Avenue
Suite 2200
Seattle, WA 98101-1688

harrykorrell@dwt.com
2067578526
Party name: Washington State Legislators
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
208 South LaSalle Street
Suite 1690
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Cara O'Callaghan, et al.
Patrick J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Mackinac Center for Public Policy
140 West Main Street
Midland, MI 48640

wright@mackinac.org
9894303912
Party name: Mackinac Center for Public Policy

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543