Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1119
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1119
Title:Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., et al.
Docketed:February 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1723, 2020-1901)
   Decision Date:September 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 4, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Waiver of right of respondent Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals International Limited to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of US Inventor Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2021Waiver of right of respondents Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of LiquidPower Specialty Products Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of Aimed Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Mar 30 2021Response Requested. (Due April 29, 2021)
Apr 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2021 to June 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2021Response to motion from petitioner Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al. filed.
Main Document
Apr 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2021.
May 18 2021Brief of respondent Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals International Limited in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 01 2021Reply of petitioners Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Charles Bennett Klein
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1700 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

cklein@winston.com
202-282-5977
Party name: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals International Limited
Constance S. HuttnerWindels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP
One Giralda Farms
Madison, NJ 07940

chuttner@windelsmarx.com
973-966-3206
Party name: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.
Other
Robert P. Greenspoon
    Counsel of Record
Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC
333 N. Michigan Ave
Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60601

rpg@fg-law.com
312-551-9500
Party name: US Inventor Inc.
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding
1700 Pensylvania Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006-2706

aparrish@kslaw.com
202-626-2627
Party name: Aimed Alliance
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
202-682-7220
Party name: LiquidPower Specialty Products Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543