Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1114
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1114
Title:American Hospital Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Docketed:February 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5048, 19-5198)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 16, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Brief amici curiae of 36 State and Regional Hospital Associations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2021 to April 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2021.
Mar 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Yale New Haven Health System, BJC Health Care, UPMC and Vanderbilt University Medical Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Federation of American Hospitals filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2021 to May 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 13, 2021.
Apr 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Rural Hospital Coalition in support of respondent filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2021Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra, Sec. of H&HS in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 28 2021Reply of petitioners American Hospital Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED. In addition to the question presented by the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Whether petitioners’ suit challenging HHS’s adjustments is precluded by 42 U. S. C. §1395l(t)(12).
Jul 09 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, American Hospital Association, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 26 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 3, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 20, 2021.
Sep 03 2021Brief of petitioners American Hospital Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2021Brief amici curiae of 37 State and Regional Hospital Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Yale New Haven Health System, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Amicus brief of States of Indiana, Georgia, Louisiana, Mississippi, Nebraska, Oklahoma, Texas, and Utah submitted.
Certificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 30, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: American Hospital Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Sec. of H&HS
Other
Thomas Richard Barker
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag, LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, CA 20006

tbarker@foleyhoag.com
202-223-1200
Party name: Federation of American Hospitals
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Georgia, Louisiana, Mississippi, Nebraska, Oklahoma, Texas, and Utah
Chad Ian Golder
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Chad Golder
514 6th Street, NE
Washington, DC 20002

golderlawoffice@gmail.com
203-506-0670
Party name: 36 State and Regional Hospital Associations
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Daniel Moshe Ortner
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dortner@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Joe Robert Reeder
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig
2101 L Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20037

reederj@gtlaw.com
202-331-3125
Party name: Rural Hospital Coalition
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
William Barnett Schultz
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
1800 M Street, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

wschultz@zuckerman.com
202-778-1800
Party name: Yale New Haven Health System, BJC Health Care, Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, Geisinger, UPMC, and Vanderbilt University Medical Center
William Barnett Schultz
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
1800 M Street, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

wschultz@zuckerman.com
202-778-1800
Party name: Yale New Haven Health System, BJC Health Care, UPMC and Vanderbilt University Medical Center
Evan Andrew Young
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

evan.young@bakerbotts.com
5123222506
Party name: National Association of Home Builders et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543