Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-111
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-111
Title:Walter N. Strand, III, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1016)
   Decision Date:March 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 2, 2020 to October 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 1, 2020.
Sep 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2020 to October 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 30, 2020.
Oct 30 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lucas Taylor Hanback
    Counsel of Record
Rogers Joseph O'Donnell P.C.
875 15th Street, NW
Suite 725
Washington, DC 20005

lhanback@rjo.com
202-777-8955
Party name: Walter N. Strand, III
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543