Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1099
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1099
Title:Gadsden Industrial Park, LLC, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 10, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2132, 2018-2147)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 11, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2021 to April 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 12, 2021.
Apr 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2021 to May 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 12, 2021.
May 12 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 01 2021Reply of petitioner Gadsden Industrial Park, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Avrum Levicoff
    Counsel of Record
The Levicoff Law Firm
4 PPG Place, Suite 200
Pittsburgh, PA 15642

alevicoff@levicofflaw.com
412-434-5200
Party name: Gadsden Industrial Park, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543