Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1094
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1094
Title:Hyundai Heavy Industries Co., Ltd., Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:February 10, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1005)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2021 to April 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 12, 2021.
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2021 to May 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 12, 2021.
May 12 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 26 2021Reply of petitioner Hyundai Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lucius B. Lau
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
701 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

alau@whitecase.com
202-626-3696
Party name: Hyundai Heavy Industries Co., Ltd.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543