Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1063
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1063
Title:Shkelzën Berisha, Petitioner
v.
Guy Lawson, et al.
Docketed:February 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10315)
   Decision Date:September 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2021Waiver of right of respondents Guy Lawson, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 17 2021Response Requested. (Due April 16, 2021)
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2021 to May 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2021.
May 17 2021Brief of respondents Guy Lawson, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2021Reply of petitioner Shkelzen Berisha filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) Justice Gorsuch, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roy Arie Katriel
    Counsel of Record
The Katriel Law Firm, P.C.
2262 Carmel Valley Road
Suite 201
Del Mar, CA 92014

rak@katriellaw.com
619-363-3333
Party name: Shkelzen Berisha
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth A. McNamara
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1251 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

lizmcnamara@dwt.com
212-603-3437
Party name: Guy Lawson, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543