Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1060
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1060
Title:Jose Oliva, Petitioner
v.
Mario Nivar, et al.
Docketed:February 3, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50795)
   Decision Date:September 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Seth W. Stoughton filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Mario Garcia to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Hector Barahona to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Peter H. Schuck filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2021Waiver of right of respondent Mario Nivar to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 03 2021Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 17 2021Response Requested. (Due April 16, 2021)
Apr 15 2021Brief of respondent Mario Nivar in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 16 2021Brief of respondents Mario Garcia and Hector Barahona in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Reply of petitioner Jose Oliva filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 24 2021Petition DENIED.
Jun 17 2021Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2021DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 02 2021Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Michael Jaicomo
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

pjaicomo@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Jose Oliva
Attorneys for Respondents
James Kerby Jopling
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
747 East San Antonio Avenue, Suite 103
El Paso, TX 79901

jim@joplinglaw.com
9155416099
Party name: Mario Nivar
Gabriel Steven Perez
    Counsel of Record
Ortega, McGlashan, Hicks & Perez
609 Myrtle Avenue suite 100
El Paso, TX 79901

gabrielperez@omhplaw.com
9155044378
Party name: Mario Garcia
Louis Elias Lopez Jr.416 N Stanton St. Ste 400
El Paso, TX 79901

llopez@lelopezlaw.com
19155439800
Party name: Hector Barahona
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Professor Seth W. Stoughton
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher, LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, Cato Institute, DKT Liberty Project, and Law Enforcement Action Partnership
Scott Payne Martin
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

smartin@perkinscoie.com
2063593600
Party name: Peter H. Schuck

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543