Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1039
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1039
Title:Elizabeth Aviles-Wynkoop, Petitioner
v.
Department of Defense
Docketed:January 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1908)
   Decision Date:September 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendixAppendixAppendix
Feb 24 2021Waiver of right of respondent Dept. of Defense to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth Aviles-Wynkoop753B Delaware Ave. SW
Washington, DC 20024

(703) 798-0214
Party name: Elizabeth Aviles-Wynkoop
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Dept. of Defense

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543