Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1034
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1034
Title:Narkis Aliza Golan, Petitioner
v.
Isacco Jacky Saada
Docketed:January 29, 2021
Linked with 21A865
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1544)
   Decision Date:October 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 14, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief of respondent Isacco Saada in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Individuals and Organizations Advocating for Victims of Domestic Violence (Sanctuary for Families, Inc., et al.) filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Frederick K. Cox International Law Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 16 2021Reply of petitioner Narkis Golan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Oct 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 10 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jan 11 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Narkis Golan
Blanket Consent
Jan 19 2022Brief of petitioner Narkis Golan filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Brief amici curiae of Child Justice, Inc., Prevent Child Abuse NY and Professor Jennifer Baum filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Isacco Saada
Blanket Consent
Jan 26 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Hague Convention Delegates Jamison Selby Borek & James Hergen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Social Workers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Frederick K. Cox International Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Domestic Violence Survivors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Individuals and Organizations Advocating for Victims of Domestic Violence (Sanctuary for Families, Inc. et al.) filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Italian Organizations Advocating for Victims of Domestic Violence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2022The record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit has been electronically filed.
Jan 28 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, March 22, 2022.
Feb 03 2022The record received from the U.S.D.C. Eastern District of New York has been electronically filed.
Feb 11 2022CIRCULATED
Feb 18 2022Brief of respondent Isacco Saada filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of International Academy of Family Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors of Law Linda J. Silberman, Robert G. Spector, and Louise Ellen Teitz filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Child Abduction Lawyers Association (CALA) filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 04 2022Proposal of respondent to lodge a copy and a certified English translation of the December 16, 2021 order of the Milan Court of First Instance in Saada v. Golan filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 07 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED in part, and the time is allotted as follows: 20 minutes for petitioner, 15 minutes for the Solicitor General, and 35 minutes for respondent.
Mar 11 2022Reply of petitioner Narkis Golan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2022The Clerk has approved respondent's lodging proposal of March 4, 2022.
Mar 15 2022Redacted order and redacted certified English translation of December 16, 2021 order of Court of First Instance of Milan lodged. (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 22 2022Argued. For petitioner: Karen R. King, New York, N. Y. For United States, as amicus curiae: Frederick Liu, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Richard Min, New York, N. Y.
Jun 15 2022Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Sotomayor, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.
Jun 24 2022Application (21A865) to issue the judgment forthwith, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 29 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED
Jun 29 2022Application (21A865) for an order to issue the judgment forthwith granted by Justice Sotomayor.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Karen R. King
    Counsel of Record
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello P.C.
565 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10017

kking@maglaw.com
212-856-9600
Party name: Narkis Golan
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Min
    Counsel of Record
Green Kaminer Min & Rockmore LLP
420 Lexington Avenue
Suite 2821
New York, NY 10170

rmin@gkmrlaw.com
2126816400
Party name: Isacco Saada
Other
Michael Edmund Burke IV
    Counsel of Record
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP
1775 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

Mike.burke@agg.com
(202) 677-4046
Party name: Professors of Law Linda J. Silberman, Robert G. Spector, and Louise Ellen Teitz
David Alan Carney
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
127 Public Square
Suite 2000
Cleveland, OH 44114

dcarney@bakerlaw.com
216-861-7634
Party name: Frederick K. Cox International Law Center
Timothy S. Durst
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
2501 North Harwood Street
Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75201-1663

tdurst@omm.com
972-360-1923
Party name: Domestic Violence Survivors
Edwin A. Freedman
    Counsel of Record
Law offices of Edwin Freedman
58 Harakevet Street
Tel Aviv lsrael, XX 6777016

edwin@edfreedman.com
036966611
Party name: International Academy of Family Lawyers
Mark Edward McDonald
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

memcdonald@cgsh.com
212-225-2333
Party name: Child Justice, Inc., Prevent Child Abuse NY and Professor Jennifer Baum
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Leah Marie Ramirez
    Counsel of Record
Markham Law Firm
7960 Old Georgetown Road
Suite 3B
Bethesda, MD 20814

LRamirez@markhamlegal.com
240-858-8716
Party name: Child Abduction Lawyers Association (CALA)
Shira Ann Scheindlin
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

sscheindlin@stroock.com
212.806.5400
Party name: Former Judges
Valentina Shaknes
    Counsel of Record
Krauss Shaknes Tallentire & Messeri LLP
350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 7620
New York, NY 10118

vshaknes@kstmlaw.com
2122285552
Party name: Italian Organizations Advocating for Victims of Domestic Violence
Shailee Diwanji Sharma
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10018

ssharma@cov.com
2128411000
Party name: Individuals and Organizations Advocating for Victims of Domestic Violence (Sanctuary for Families, Inc. et al.)
Rachel Greenwald Skaistis
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP
824 Eight Avenue
New York, NY 10019

rskaistis@cravath.com
212-474-1000
Party name: The National Association of Social Workers; Institute on Violence, Abuse and Trauma; The National Partnership to End Interpersonal Violence Across the Lifespan; Dean Jeffrey Edleson, Ph.D.; Professor Evan Stark, Ph.D.; Luz Towns-Miranda, Ph.D.; Marie G. Rudden, M.D.; Joyanna Silberg, Ph.D.; Professor Jean Mercer, Ph.D.; Professor Megan Goslin, Ph.D. and Professor Chitra Raghavan, Ph.D.
Amir Cameron Tayrani
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

atayrani@gibsondunn.com
(202) 887-3692
Party name: Hague Convention Delegates Jamison Selby Borek & James Hergen
Brian Christopher Vertz
    Counsel of Record
Pollock Begg LLC
525 William Penn Place
Suite 3501
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

bvertz@pollockbegg.com
412-471-9000
Party name: American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543