Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1033
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1033
Title:Grupo Cementos de Chihuahua S.A.B. de C.V., et al., Petitioners
v.
Compañía de Inversiones Mercantiles, S.A.
Docketed:January 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1151)
   Decision Date:August 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 14 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Waiver of right of respondent Compañía de Inversiones Mercantiles, S.A. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 15 2021Response Requested. (Due April 14, 2021)
Mar 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2021 to May 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2021.
May 14 2021Brief of respondent Compañía de Inversiones Mercantiles, S.A. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 01 2021Reply of petitioners Grupo Cementos de Chihuahua, S.A.B. de C.V., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Derek L. Shaffer
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

derekshaffer@quinnemanuel.com
(202) 538-8000
Party name: Grupo Cementos de Chihuahua, S.A.B. de C.V., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Eliot Lauer
    Counsel of Record
Curtis Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP
101 Park Avenue, 35th Floor
New York, NY 10178

elauer@curtis.com
2126966000
Party name: Compañía de Inversiones Mercantiles, S.A.
Gabriel HertzbergCurtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP
101 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10178

ghertzberg@curtis.com
212-696-8856
Party name: Compañía de Inversiones Mercantiles, S.A.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543