Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1032
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1032
Title:Petrobras America Incorporated, et al., Petitioners
v.
Vantage Deepwater Company, et al.
Docketed:January 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-20435)
   Decision Date:July 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 25 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021Waiver of right of respondents Vantage Deepwater Company, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ari MacKinnon
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen and Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

amackinnon@cgsh.com
212-225-2243
Party name: Petrobras America Incorporated, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Vantage Deepwater Company, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543