Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1004
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1004
Title:Robert Collier, Petitioner
v.
Dallas County Hospital District, dba Parkland Health & Hospital System
Docketed:January 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10761)
   Decision Date:September 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2021Waiver of right of respondent Dallas County Hospital District, dba Parkland Health & Hospital System to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 12 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Howard University School of Law Human and Civil Rights Clinic.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2021Response Requested. (Due March 18, 2021)
Mar 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2021 to April 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2021.
Mar 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Social Science Experts, Race Equity Scholars, Law Professors, and Civil Rights Entities filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2021Brief of respondent Dallas County Hospital District, dba Parkland Health & Hospital System in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2021Reply of petitioner Robert Collier filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Howard University School of Law Human and Civil Rights Clinic GRANTED.
May 17 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
202-661-6582
Party name: Robert Collier
Attorneys for Respondent
Joshua James Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Carter Arnett PLLC
8150 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 500
Dallas, TX 75206

jbennett@carterarnett.com
2145508188
Party name: Dallas County Hospital District, dba Parkland Health & Hospital System
Other
Kelly M. Dermody
    Counsel of Record
Lieff Cabraser Heimann @ Berstein LLP
275 Battery Street
29th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

kdermody@lchb.com
(415) 956-1000
Party name: Social Science Experts, Race Equity Scholars, Law Professors, and Civil Rights Entities
Jennifer A. Holmes
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legai Defense & Educationai Fund. inc.
700 14th Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

jholmes@naacpldf.org
2026821300
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc
Edward Henderson Williams II
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law
2900 Van Ness Street NW
Washington, DC 20008

ed.williams@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6487
Party name: Howard University School of Law Human and Civil Rights Clinic

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543