Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1003
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1003
Title:Christy, Inc., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1738)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 02 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Christy, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Feb 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of Masimo Corporation filed. (Received Feb. 25, 2021)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Francis McDonough III
    Counsel of Record
Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC
3621 Vinings Slope, Suite 4320
Atlanta, GA 30339

jmcdonough@hgdlawfirm.com
(404) 996-0869
Party name: Christy, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Stephen Wayne Larson
    Counsel of Record
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, LLP
2040 Main Street
14th Floor
Irvine, CA 92614

stephen.larson@knobbe.com
(949) 760-0404
Party name: Masimo Corporation
Laurence Henry Tribe
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School
Faculty Office Building
Cambridge, MA 02138

tribe@law.harvard.edu
6175127018
Party name: Fair Inventing Fund

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543