Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A886
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A886
Title:Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH, Applicant
v.
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Docketed:February 7, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1368 2019-1369)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2020Application (19A886) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 10 2020UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, case Nos. 2019-1368 and 2019-1369, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Thursday, February 13, 2020, by 4:30 p.m. ET, and further order of the undersigned or of the Court.
Feb 13 2020Response to application from respondent Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2020The order heretofore issued by The Chief Justice on February 10, 2020, is vacated. The application for a stay is, in all respects, denied.
Feb 14 2020Reply of applicant Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH filed.
Reply

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Baker Banks
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153

adam.banks@weil.com
212 310-8000
Party name: Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
Attorneys for Respondent
Douglas H Carsten
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
12235 El Camino Real
San Diego, CA 92130

dcarsten@wsgr.com
8583502305
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543