Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A766
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A766
Title:Henry Schein, Inc., Applicant
v.
Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Docketed:January 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-41674)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2020Application (19A766) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Response to application (19A766) requested by Justice Alito, due Tuesday, January 21, 2020, by 3 p.m. ET.
Jan 21 2020Response to application from respondent Archer and White Sales, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 23 2020Reply of applicant Henry Schein, Inc. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jan 24 2020Application (19A766) referred to the Court.
Jan 24 2020Application (19A766) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, case No. 2:12-cv-572, are stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Ginsburg would deny the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Henry Schein, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lewis T. LeClair
    Counsel of Record
McKool Smith
300 Cresent Court
Suite 1500
Dallas, TX 75201

lleclair@mckoolsmith.com
214-978-4984
Party name: Archer and White Sales, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543