Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A645
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A645
Title:Eric F. Kelly, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:December 10, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(19-0156/AR)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2019Application (19A645) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 15, 2019 to February 13, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 11 2019Application (19A645) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 13, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Zachary D Spilman
    Counsel of Record
The Law Office of Zachary Spilman
29 North Main Street #97
Sherborn, MA 01770

zack@zacharyspilman.com
844-774-5626
Party name: Eric Kelly
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543