Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A640
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A640
Title:Donald J. Trump, et al., Applicants
v.
Deutsche Bank AG, et al.
Docketed:December 6, 2019
Linked with 19-760
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1540)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 06 2019Application (19A640) to recall and stay mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 06 2019UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicants, IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, case No. 19-1540, issued December 3, 2019, is hereby recalled and stayed until 5 p.m. on December 13, 2019. It is further ordered that a response be filed on or before December 11, 2019, by 11 a.m.
Dec 11 2019Response to application from respondents Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 12 2019Reply of applicants Trump, Donald J., et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Dec 13 2019Application (19A640) referred to the Court.
Dec 13 2019Application (19A640) granted by the Court.
Dec 13 2019The application (19A640) for stay presented to Justice Ginsburg and by her referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, case No. 19-1540, is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. In addition, the application is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari, and the petition is granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-715 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The cases will be set for argument in the March 2020 argument session.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
2075223163
Party name: Trump, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
2022259700
Party name: Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives; Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543