Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A615 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A615 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al., Applicants
v.
James H. Roane, Jr., et al.
Docketed:December 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5322)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 02 2019Application (19A615) for a stayor vacatur, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 03 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Arizona, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Response to application from respondent Daniel Lewis Lee filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 05 2019Reply of applicants Barr, Att'y Gen., et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Dec 06 2019Application (19A615) referred to the Court.
Dec 06 2019Application (19A615) denied by the Court. We expect that the Court of Appeals will render its decision with appropriate dispatch. Statement of JUSTICE ALITO, with whom JUSTICE GORSUCH and JUSTICE KAVANAUGH join, respecting the denial of stay or vacatur. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: In Re Federal Bureau of Prisons' Execution Protocol Caes
Attorneys for Respondents
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Daniel Lewis Lee
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212)-937-7294
Party name: Wesley Ira Purkey
Other
Rusty Duane Crandell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Arizona
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

Rusty.Crandell@azag.gov
6025428540
Party name: Arizona, Alabama, Arkansas, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Nebraska, Ohio, South Carolina, Texas, and Utah

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543