Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A592
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A592
Title:Erica Y. Bryant, et al., Applicants
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:November 26, 2019
Linked with 19-982
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17573)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2019Application (19A592) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 4, 2019 to February 2, 2020, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Application (19A592) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 2, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jay L. T. Breakstone
    Counsel of Record
Parker Waichman LLP
6 Harbor Park Drive
Port Washington, NY 11050

jbreakstone@yourlawyer.com
516-466-6500
Party name: Erica Y. Bryant, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of the Navy, United States of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543