Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A59
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A59
Title:Brian Kirk Malpasso, et al., Applicants
v.
William M. Pallozzi, in His Official Capacity as Maryland Secretary of State Police
Docketed:July 15, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2377)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 11 2019Application (19A59) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2019 to September 26, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 15 2019Application (19A59) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 26, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Brian Malpasso, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543