Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A441
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A441
Title:Paul D. Voorhees, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:October 22, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(18-0372)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2019Application (19A441) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 6, 2019 to December 23, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Application (19A441) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 23, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald G. Rehkopf Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Donald G. Rehkopf, Jr
31 East Main Street
2nd Floor
Rochester, NY 14614

usmilitarylaw@gmail.com
(585) 434-0232
Party name: Paul Voorhees
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543