Docket for 19A368
|
Oct 01 2019 | Application (19A368) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Oct 02 2019 | Letter of applicants BP P.L.C., et al. received. | | Main DocumentOther | Oct 04 2019 | Response to application (19A368) requested by The Chief Justice, due Friday, October 18, 2019, by 3 p.m. ET. | | | Oct 04 2019 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Manufacturers. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Oct 10 2019 | Letter of applicant BP P.L.C., et al. received. | | Main Document | Oct 18 2019 | Response to application from respondent Mayor and City Council of Baltimore filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 22 2019 | Application (19A368) referred to the Court. | | | Oct 22 2019 | Application (19A368) denied by the Court. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this application. | | |
|