Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A309
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A309
Title:Amy Corbitt, Applicant
v.
Michael Vickers
Docketed:September 17, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15566)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2019Application (19A309) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 20 2019Application (19A309) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 6, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Amy Corbitt

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543