Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A308
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A308
Title:Joseph A. Zadeh, et al., Applicants
v.
Mari Robinson, et al.
Docketed:September 17, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-50518)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2019Application (19A308) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 30, 2019 to October 30, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Application (19A308) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 30, 2019.
Oct 17 2019Application (19A308) to extend further the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 30, 2019 to November 27, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Oct 17 2019Application (19A308) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 27, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Joseph Zadeh, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543