Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A246
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A246
Title:Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., Applicants
v.
J.D., on Behalf of Herself and others Similarly Situated, et al.
Docketed:August 30, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5093)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 30 2019Application (19A246) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 12, 2019 to October 15, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 03 2019Application (19A246) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 15, 2019.
Oct 03 2019Application (19A246) to extend further the time from October 15, 2019 to November 8, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Application (19A246) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 8, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Alex Michael Azar, II, Secretary, Healt And Human Services,, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543