Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A230
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A230
Title:William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al., Applicants
v.
East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, et al.
Docketed:August 26, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16487)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 26 2019Application (19A230) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Aug 27 2019Response to application (19A230) requested by Justice Kagan, due Wednesday, September 4, 2019, by 3 p.m.
Sep 03 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Main Document
Sep 03 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Arizona, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Response to application from respondents East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Non-Profit Organizations and Law School Clinics.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Sep 06 2019Reply of applicants William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Supplemental brief of applicants William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Letter of applicants William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al. received.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019Application (19A230) referred to the Court.
Sep 11 2019Application (19A230) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to JUSTICE KAGAN and by her referred to the Court is granted. The district court’s July 24, 2019 order granting a preliminary injunction and September 9, 2019 order restoring the nationwide scope of the injunction are stayed in full pending disposition of the Government’s appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the Government’s petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is sought. If a writ of certiorari is sought and the Court denies the petition, this order shall terminate automatically. If the Court grants the petition for a writ of certiorari, this order shall terminate when the Court enters its judgment. JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, with whom JUSTICE GINSBURG joins, dissenting from grant of stay. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: William P., Attorney General of the United States Barr, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lee Gelernt
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad St.
New York, NY 10004-2400

lgelernt@aclu.org
2125492616
Party name: East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, et al.
Other
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Rusty Duane Crandell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Arizona
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

Rusty.Crandell@azag.gov
6025428540
Party name: Willam Bar, et al.
Karen Musalo
    Counsel of Record
Center for Gender & Refugee Studies
200 McAllister Street
San Francisco, CA 94102

musalok@uchastings.edu
4155654877
Party name: Twenty Eight Non-Profit Organizations and Law School Clinics

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543