Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A201
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A201
Title:Pennsylvania, Applicant
v.
Michael J. Hicks
Docketed:August 20, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(56 MAP 2017)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2019Application (19A201) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2019 to September 27, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 20 2019Application (19A201) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 27, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James B. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Lehigh County District Attorney's Office
455 W. Hamilton Street
Allentown, PA 18101

jamesmartin@lehighcounty.org
610-782-3100
Party name: Pennsylvania

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543