Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A1071
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A1071
Title:Bonnie Raysor, et al., Applicants
v.
Ron DeSantis, Governor of Florida, et al.
Docketed:July 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-12003)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 08 2020Application (19A1071) to vacate stay, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 10 2020Response to application (19A1071) requested by Justice Thomas, due Tuesday, July 14, 2020, by 4 p.m. ET.
Jul 14 2020Response to application from respondents Ron DeSantis, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 15 2020Reply of applicants Bonnie Raysor, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jul 16 2020Application (19A1071) referred to the Court.
Jul 16 2020Application (19A1071) denied by the Court. The application to vacate stay presented to JUSTICE THOMAS and by him referred to the Court is denied. JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, with whom JUSTICE GINSBURG and JUSTICE KAGAN join, dissenting from denial of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1101 14th Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: Bonnie Raysor, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Ron DeSantis, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543