Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A1070
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A1070
Title:Calvary Chapel Dayton Valley, Applicant
v.
Steve Sisolak, Governor of Nevada, et al.
Docketed:July 8, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-16169)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 08 2020Application (19A1070) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jul 09 2020Response to application (19A1070) requested by Justice Kagan, due Wednesday, July 15, 2020, by 4 p.m. ET.
Jul 15 2020Response to application from respondents Steve Sisolak, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 16 2020Reply of applicant Calvary Chapel Dayton Valley filed.
Reply
Jul 24 2020Application (19A1070) referred to the Court.
Jul 24 2020Application (19A1070) denied by the Court. JUSTICE ALITO, with whom JUSTICE THOMAS and JUSTICE KAVANAUGH join, dissenting from denial of application for injunctive relief. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE GORSUCH, dissenting from denial of application for injunctive relief. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE KAVANAUGH, dissenting from denial of application for injunctive relief. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Andrew Cortman
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
1000 Hurricane Shoals Road, NE
Suite D-1100
Lawrenceville, GA 30043

dcortman@adflegal.org
7703390774
Party name: Calvary Chapel Dayton Valley
Attorneys for Respondents
Heidi Jill Parry Stern
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Nevada Attorney General
555 E. Washington Ave., Suite 3900
Las Vegas, NV 89101

hstern@ag.nv.gov
702-486-3594
Party name: Steve Sisolak, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543