Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A1058
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A1058
Title:Samark Jose Lopez Bello, et al., Applicants
v.
Keith Stansell, et al.
Docketed:June 26, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-11736 19-13957 19-11415)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 26 2020Application (19A1058) for a stay, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 29 2020Application (19A1058) denied by Justice Thomas.
Jul 01 2020Application (19A1058) refiled and submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestOtherProof of ServiceWritten Request
Jul 16 2020Application (19A1058) referred to the Court.
Jul 16 2020DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 03 2020Application (19A1058) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Carroll Connell
    Counsel of Record
Archer & Greiner
One Centennial square
Haddonfield, NJ 08033

jconnell@archerlaw.com
856-795-2121
Party name: Samark Jose Lopez Bello, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543