Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A1034
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A1034
Title:Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al., Applicants
v.
Bryan Collier, Executive Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, et al.
Docketed:May 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-20207)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 04 2020Application (19A1034) to vacate stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
May 04 2020Response to application (19A1034) requested by Justice Alito, due Friday, May 8, by 5 p.m. ET
May 08 2020Response to application from respondents Bryan Collier, et al. filed.
Main Document
May 09 2020Reply of applicants Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al. filed.
Reply
May 12 2020Supplemental brief of applicants Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al. filed.
Main Document
May 12 2020Response to supplemental brief filed by respondents Bryan Collier, et al.
Main Document
May 14 2020Application (19A1034) referred to the Court.
May 14 2020Application (19A1034) denied by the Court. Statement of JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, with whom JUSTICE GINSBURG joins, respecting the denial of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brandon W. Duke
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
800 Capitol Street
Suite 2400
Houston, TX 77002-5242

bduke@winston.com
7136512636
Party name: Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Bryan Collier, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543