Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-985
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-985
Title:Native Wholesale Supply Company, Petitioner
v.
California, ex rel. Xavier Becerra, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:February 6, 2020
Linked with 19A629
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(C084031, C084961)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 25, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2019Application (19A629) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 24, 2019 to February 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 05 2019Application (19A629) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 3, 2020.
Feb 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Waiver of right of respondent California, ex rel. Xavier Becerra, Attorney General to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 05 2020Response Requested. (Due April 6, 2020)
Mar 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2020 to May 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Randolph Henry Barnhouse
    Counsel of Record
Barnhouse Keegan Solimon & West LLP
7424 4th Street NW
Los Ranchos de Albuquerque, NM 87107

dbarnhouse@indiancountrylaw.com
505-842-6123
Party name: Native Wholesale Supply Company
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua A. Klein
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice - Office of the Solicitor General
1515 Clay Street
Suite 2000
Oakland, CA 94612-1413

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
510-879-0756
Party name: California, ex rel. Xavier Becerra, Attorney General

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543