Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-983
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-983
Title:Colleen Reilly, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:February 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2884)
   Decision Date:October 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 3, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 6, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 6, 2020 to April 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 6, 2020.
Apr 06 2020Waiver of right of respondents City of Harrisburg, Harrisburg City Council, and Eric Papenfuse, in his official capacity as Mayor of Harrisburg to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 17 2020Response Requested. (Due May 18, 2020)
Apr 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2020 to June 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 29 2020Response to motion from petitioner Colleen Reilly, et al. filed.
Main Document
Apr 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including May 26, 2020.
May 26 2020Brief of respondents City of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 09 2020Reply of petitioners Colleen Reilly, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

mat@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Colleen Reilly, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Maureen Murphy McBride
    Counsel of Record
Lamb McErlane PC
24 East Market
Box 565
West Chester, PA 19381-0565

mmcbride@lambmcerlane.com
610-701-4410
Party name: City of Harrisburg, Harrisburg City Council, and Eric Papenfuse, in his official capacity as Mayor of Harrisburg
Frank J. Lavery Jr.Lavery Law
225 Market Street
Suite 304, PO Box 1245
Harrisburg, PA 17108-1245

flavery@laverylaw.com
7172336633
Party name: City of Harrisburg, Harrisburg City Council, and Eric Papenfuse, in his official capacity as Mayor of Harrisburg

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543