Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-971
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-971
Title:Angela James, et al., Petitioners
v.
JW Gaming Development, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Docketed:February 3, 2020
Linked with 19A714
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-17008)
   Decision Date:October 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2019Application (19A714) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 31, 2019 to January 30, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentOther
Dec 27 2019Application (19A714) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 30, 2020.
Jan 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2020Waiver of right of respondent JW Gaming Development, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 09 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Rudolph Edward Verner
    Counsel of Record
Berg Hill Greenleaf & Ruscitti LLP
1712 Pearl Street
Boulder, CO 80302

rev@bhgrlaw.com
3034021600
Party name: Pinoleville Pomo Nation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gregory M. NarvaezFredericks Peebles & Patterson, LLP
2020 L Street, Suite 250
Sacramento, CA 95811

gnarvaez@ndnlaw.com
916-441-2700
Party name: JW Gaming Development, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543