Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-963
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-963
Title:Henry Schein, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Docketed:January 31, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-41674)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 6, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief of respondent Archer and White Sales, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
May 21 2020Reply of petitioner Henry Schein, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 15 2020Petition GRANTED.
Jun 25 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 08 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Henry Schein, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jul 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 21, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 13, 2020.
Aug 21 2020Motion for leave to file the joint appendix under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by petitioner Henry Schein, Inc.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Joint appendix (Redacted copies for the Public) filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Brief of petitioner Henry Schein, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 26 2020Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Benco Dental Supply Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 8, 2020.
Oct 05 2020Motion of petitioner for leave to file the joint appendix under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED.
Oct 08 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Oct 13 2020Brief of respondent Archer and White Sales, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Oct 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor George A. Bermann filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Daniel D. Barnhizer, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Arbitrators, Arbitration Practitioners, and Arbitration Scholars filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Brief amici curiae of American Association for Justice & Public Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of William R. Weinstein filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2020CIRCULATED
Nov 12 2020Reply of petitioner Henry Schein, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Henry Schein, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose & Jefferson LLP
Walnut Glen Tower
8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75231

dgeyser@adjtlaw.com
214-396-0441
Party name: Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Lewis T. LeClairMcKool Smith
300 Cresent Court
Suite 1500
Dallas, TX 75201

lleclair@mckoolsmith.com
214-978-4984
Party name: Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Other
David M. Axelrad
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz and Levy LLP
3601 West Olive Avenue
8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505-4681

daxelrad@horvitzlevy.com
818-995-0800
Party name: DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar
Erin Glenn Busby
    Counsel of Record
The University of Texas School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

ebusby@law.utexas.edu
7139660409
Party name: Professors Daniel D. Barnhizer, Jeffrey L. Harrison, David Horton, Lee Kovarsky, Stephen I. Vladeck, and Ernest A. Young
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Kenneth L Racowski
    Counsel of Record
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
Two Liberty Place
50 S 16th Street, Suite 3200
Philadelphia, PA 19102

kenneth.racowski@bipc.com
215-665-8700
Party name: Benco Dental Supply Company
Imre Stephen Szalai
    Counsel of Record
Loyola University New Orleans College of Law
7214 St. Charles Avenue
Box 901
New Orleans, LA 70118

iszalai@loyno.edu
858-692-3654
Party name: Arbitrators, Arbitration Practitioners, and Arbitration Scholars
J. Samuel Tenenbaum
    Counsel of Record
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 06011

s-tenenbaum@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-4808
Party name: Professor George A. Bermann
William Robert Weinstein
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of William R. Weinstein
199 Main Street
4th Floor
White Plains, NY 10601

wrw@wweinsteinlaw.com
914.997.2205
Party name: William R. Weinstein
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: American Association for Justice & Public Justice

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543