Docket for 19-959
|
Dec 05 2019 | Application (19A631) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 30, 2019 to January 29, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 06 2019 | Application (19A631) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 29, 2020. | | | Jan 29 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 19 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 2, 2020 to April 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 21 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2020. | | | Mar 02 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Center for the Rule of Law filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 01 2020 | Brief of respondents Daniel Williams, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 14 2020 | Reply of petitioner TAMKO Building Products, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 15 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020. | | | May 04 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|