Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-942
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-942
Title:Laurel Zuckerman, as Ancillary Administratrix of the Estate of Alice Leffmann, Petitioner
v.
The Metropolitan Museum of Art
Docketed:January 28, 2020
Linked with 19A562
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-634)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2019Application (19A562) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2019 to January 24, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main Document
Nov 19 2019Application (19A562) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until January 24, 2020.
Jan 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Waiver of right of respondent The Metropolitan Museum of Art to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 11 2020Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Laurel Zuckerman, as Ancillary Administratrix of the Estate of Alice Leffmann not accepted for filing. (February 12, 2020 - petitioner has not granted blanket consent)
Feb 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Feb 14 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Laurel Zuckerman, as Ancillary Administratrix of the Estate of Alice Leffmann
Blanket Consent
Feb 20 2020Brief amici curiae of The 1939 Society, Bet Tzedek, and The Holocaust Education Center in the Desert, Inc. d/b/a Tolerance Education Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2020Brief amici curiae of B'nai B'rith International, Raoul Wallenberg Centre for Human Rights, Simon Wiesenthal Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Armenian Bar Association and Armenian Legal Center for Justice and Human Rights filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 25 2020Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 25 2020Brief amicus curiae of James D. Bindenagel filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of Byrne Goldenberg & Hamilton, PLLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mary-Christine Sungaila
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
600 Anton Boulevard
Suite 700
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

MC.Sungaila@haynesboone.com
(949) 202-3062
Party name: Laurel Zuckerman, as Ancillary Administratrix of the Estate of Alice Leffmann
Attorneys for Respondent
David William Bowker
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

david.bowker@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6558
Party name: The Metropolitan Museum of Art
Other
Andrew Harry Erteschik
    Counsel of Record
Poyner Spruill LLP
P.O. Box 1801
Raleigh, NC 27602-1801

aerteschik@poynerspruill.com
919-783-2895
Party name: Current and Former Members of Congress
Thomas J. Hamilton
    Counsel of Record
Byrne Goldenberg & Hamilton PLLC
1025 Connecticut Avenue NW
Suite 1012
Washington, DC 20036

tj.ham@cox.net
202-857-9775
Party name: Byrne Goldenberg & Hamilton, PLLC
Jennifer Anglim Kreder
    Counsel of Record
NKU- Chase College of Law
Nunn Drive
Heighland Heights, KY 41099

jen@jenniferkreder.com
12125181751
Party name: B'nai B'rith International, Raoul Wallenberg Centre for Human Rights, Simon Wiesenthal Center, et al.
Seepan Vartan Parseghian
    Counsel of Record
Beck Redden LLP
1221 McKinney Street, Suite 4500
Houston, TX 77010

sparseghian@beckredden.com
713-951-3700
Party name: Armenian Bar Association and Armenian Legal Center for Justice and Human Rights
Owen C. Pell
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1095

opell@whitecase.com
212-819-8891
Party name: James D. Bindenagel
Leigh Ann Schell
    Counsel of Record
Adams and Reese LLP
701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500
New Orleans, LA 70139

leighann.schell@arlaw.com
504-581-3234
Party name: Law Professors
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP
11355 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angles, CA 90064

bshatz@manatt.com
3103124383
Party name: The 1939 Society, Bet Tzedek, and The Holocaust Education Center in the Desert, Inc. d/b/a Tolerance Education Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543