Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-941 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-941 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Billy Daniel Raulerson, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Warden
Docketed:January 28, 2020
Linked with 19A512
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-14038)
   Decision Date:June 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 27, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2019Application (19A512) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 25, 2019 to January 24, 2020, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 14 2019Application (19A512) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 24, 2020.
Jan 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2020Brief of respondent Warden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 27 2020Brief amici curiae of Disability Rights Legal Center, National Disability Rights Network, Center For Public Representation, Georgia Advocacy Office, Stephen N. Xenakis, James R. Merikangas, And Steven Eidelman filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 27 2020Brief amici curiae of Southern Center for Human Rights filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2020Reply of petitioner Billy Daniel Raulerson, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 30 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David W. DeBruin
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

DDeBruin@jenner.com
202-639-6015
Party name: Billy Daniel Raulerson, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sabrina D. Graham
    Counsel of Record
Senior Assistant Attorney General
40 Capitol Sq., SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

sgraham@law.ga.gov
4046947975
Party name: Warden
Other
Michael Boland Admirand
    Counsel of Record
Southern Center for Human Rights
60 Walton Street NW
Atlanta, GA 30303

madmirand@schr.org
404-688-1202
Party name: Southern Center for Human Rights
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Disability Rights Legal Center, National Disability Rights Network, Center For Public Representation, Georgia Advocacy Office, Stephen N. Xenakis, James R. Merikangas, And Steven Eidelman

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543